THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:46:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
4265 Sherwoodtowne Blvd
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 238-1217
Fax: (905) 238-1796

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
4265 Sherwoodtowne Blvd
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 238-1217
Fax: (905) 238-1796

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
31 Dec 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 31 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., December 31, 2013, by order of the Fitness to Practise
Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following
terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
registration held by Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek:

* Dr. Piatek shall not engage in the practice of medicine unless he meets
the following conditions:

(a) Within 90 days of this Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a qualified
psychiatrist or psychologist with expertise in treatment of
personality disorders and delusional disorder and acceptable to the
College ("Psychiatric Monitor");

(b) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Psychiatric
Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on
incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the
Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report
of Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr.
Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the
Undertaking described below, the Psychiatric Monitor shall be
required to read and review all of the foregoing;

(c) The Psychiatric Monitor shall execute an Undertaking with the
College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other
things, shall require the Psychiatric Monitor to :

(i) Provide written reports to the College every three months;
and
(ii) If the psychiatric monitor determines that Dr. Piatek's
condition may affect his care of patients, that he has failed
to attend for appointments, or that he is not in compliance
with this Order, the psychiatric monitor shall make an
immediate report to the College.

(d) Dr. Piatek shall attend his Psychiatric Monitor for active
psychotherapy at least once weekly, focussing on treatment of his
condition and management of associated behaviors;

(e) The Psychiatric Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek
or the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or
desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations,
including such information that may be necessary for the
Psychiatric Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek
shall cooperate with the Psychiatric Monitor in this regard.

(f) Within 90 days of the Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a clinical
monitor ("Clinical Monitor") who is acceptable to the College;

(g) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Clinical
Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on
incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the
Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report
of Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr.
Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the
Undertaking described below, the Clinical Monitor shall be required
to read and review all of the foregoing;

(h) The Clinical Monitor will execute an Undertaking with the College in a
form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require
the Clinical Monitor to report to the College immediately if Dr. Piatek's
patient care or record keeping represents a risk to his patients;

(i) Once every two weeks, the Clinical Monitor shall: (i) attend Dr. Piatek's
practice to observe Dr. Piatek's care and treatment of two or more
patients selected in accordance with the Clinical Monitor's discretion;
and (ii) review at least ten patient records randomly selected by the
Clinical Monitor;

(j) The Clinical Monitor shall provide reports to the College once every
three months in respect of Dr. Piatek's patient care and record keeping;

(k) The Clinical Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the
College that the Clinical Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the
monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information
that may be necessary for the Clinical Monitor to verify statements of
Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Clinical Monitor in this
regard.

(l) Dr. Piatek shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Monitor to the
College, and by the College to his Clinical Monitor, of all information
the Clinical Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order
to fulfill the Clinical Monitor's Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Piatek's
compliance with the Order.

(m) The reports of Dr. Piatek's Clinical Monitor shall be provided by the
College to the Psychiatric Monitor. The Psychiatric Monitor may request
any further information from the Clinical Monitor or from the College
that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or desirable in order to
permit the Psychiatric Monitor to perform the terms of the Undertaking;

(n) Dr. Piatek shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Monitor
with respect to practice improvements and education;

(o) If the Psychiatric Monitor or the Clinical Monitor who has given the
Undertaking is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr.
Piatek shall cease to practise immediately until such time as he has
retained another Psychiatric Monitor or Clinical Monitor acceptable to
the College;

(p) Dr. Piatek shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses
associated with the terms of this Order;

(q) This Order shall take effect 90 days after the date of the Order. The
terms of the current Order under s. 62 of the Code shall remain in force
until the terms of this Order take effect; and

(r) The clinical monitoring and the psychiatric monitoring described in this
Order are to be for an indefinite period.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., December 31, 2013, by order of the Fitness to Practise
Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following
terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
registration held by Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek:

* Dr. Piatek shall not engage in the practice of medicine unless he meets
the following conditions:

(a) Within 90 days of this Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a qualified
psychiatrist or psychologist with expertise in treatment of
personality disorders and delusional disorder and acceptable to the
College ("Psychiatric Monitor");

(b) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Psychiatric
Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on
incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the
Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report
of Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr.
Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the
Undertaking described below, the Psychiatric Monitor shall be
required to read and review all of the foregoing;

(c) The Psychiatric Monitor shall execute an Undertaking with the
College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other
things, shall require the Psychiatric Monitor to :

(i) Provide written reports to the College every three months;
and
(ii) If the psychiatric monitor determines that Dr. Piatek's
condition may affect his care of patients, that he has failed
to attend for appointments, or that he is not in compliance
with this Order, the psychiatric monitor shall make an
immediate report to the College.

(d) Dr. Piatek shall attend his Psychiatric Monitor for active
psychotherapy at least once weekly, focussing on treatment of his
condition and management of associated behaviors;

(e) The Psychiatric Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek
or the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or
desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations,
including such information that may be necessary for the
Psychiatric Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek
shall cooperate with the Psychiatric Monitor in this regard.

(f) Within 90 days of the Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a clinical
monitor ("Clinical Monitor") who is acceptable to the College;

(g) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Clinical
Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on
incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the
Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report
of Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr.
Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the
Undertaking described below, the Clinical Monitor shall be required
to read and review all of the foregoing;

(h) The Clinical Monitor will execute an Undertaking with the College in a
form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require
the Clinical Monitor to report to the College immediately if Dr. Piatek's
patient care or record keeping represents a risk to his patients;

(i) Once every two weeks, the Clinical Monitor shall: (i) attend Dr. Piatek's
practice to observe Dr. Piatek's care and treatment of two or more
patients selected in accordance with the Clinical Monitor's discretion;
and (ii) review at least ten patient records randomly selected by the
Clinical Monitor;

(j) The Clinical Monitor shall provide reports to the College once every
three months in respect of Dr. Piatek's patient care and record keeping;

(k) The Clinical Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the
College that the Clinical Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the
monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information
that may be necessary for the Clinical Monitor to verify statements of
Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Clinical Monitor in this
regard.

(l) Dr. Piatek shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Monitor to the
College, and by the College to his Clinical Monitor, of all information
the Clinical Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order
to fulfill the Clinical Monitor's Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Piatek's
compliance with the Order.

(m) The reports of Dr. Piatek's Clinical Monitor shall be provided by the
College to the Psychiatric Monitor. The Psychiatric Monitor may request
any further information from the Clinical Monitor or from the College
that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or desirable in order to
permit the Psychiatric Monitor to perform the terms of the Undertaking;

(n) Dr. Piatek shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Monitor
with respect to practice improvements and education;

(o) If the Psychiatric Monitor or the Clinical Monitor who has given the
Undertaking is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr.
Piatek shall cease to practise immediately until such time as he has
retained another Psychiatric Monitor or Clinical Monitor acceptable to
the College;

(p) Dr. Piatek shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses
associated with the terms of this Order;

(q) This Order shall take effect 90 days after the date of the Order. The
terms of the current Order under s. 62 of the Code shall remain in force
until the terms of this Order take effect; and

(r) The clinical monitoring and the psychiatric monitoring described in this
Order are to be for an indefinite period.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (3)

Date of Decision: 27 Nov 2013
Summary of Decision:
On November 27, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that his relevant to his suitability to practise, and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Piatek admitted the allegations.

On December 19, 2011, Dr. Piatek plead guilty to, and was convicted of, the following charge: that he did, in the city of Mississauga, between January 1, 2008 and July 30, 2009, submit billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits and did thereby commit an offense contrary to the Health Insurance Act, Section 44(1)(a).

Dr. Piatek has been found guilty of professional misconduct by the CPSO's Discipline Committee on one prior occasion. On August 12, 2008, he admitted to having been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice by willfully evading the payment of income taxes.

Dr. Piatek is currently subject to terms, conditions and limitations imposed by Order of the Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

Dr. Piatek attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Piatek pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 27, 2013

Proceeding Type: Incapacity referral to Fitness to Practise Committee
Date of Decision: 18 Apr 2013
Summary of Decision:
On April 18, 2013, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek is incapacitated, as defined in s. 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On October 2, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that the following terms, conditions and limitations be placed on Dr. Piatek's certificate of registration:

Dr. Piatek shall not engage in the practice of medicine unless he meets the following conditions:

(a) Within 90 days of this Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a qualified psychiatrist or psychologist with expertise in treatment of personality disorders and delusional disorder and acceptable to the College ("Psychiatric Monitor");

(b) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Psychiatric Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report of
Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr. Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the Undertaking described below, the Psychiatric Monitor shall be required to read and review all of the foregoing;

(c) The Psychiatric Monitor shall execute an Undertaking with the College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require the Psychiatric Monitor to:
(i) Provide written reports to the College every three months; and
(ii) If the psychiatric monitor determines that Dr. Piatek's condition may affect his care of patients, that he has failed to attend for appointments, or that he is not in compliance with this Order, the psychiatric monitor shall make an immediate report to the College.

(d) Dr. Piatek shall attend his Psychiatric Monitor for active psychotherapy at least once weekly, focussing on treatment of his condition and management of associated behaviors;

(e) The Psychiatric Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information that may be necessary for the Psychiatric Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Psychiatric Monitor in this regard.

(f) Within 90 days of the Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a clinical monitor ("Clinical Monitor") who is acceptable to the College;

(g) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Clinical Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report of Dr.
Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr. Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the Undertaking described below, the Clinical Monitor shall be required to read and review all of the foregoing;

(h) The Clinical Monitor will execute an Undertaking with the College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require the Clinical Monitor to report to the College immediately if Dr. Piatek's patient care or record keeping represents a risk to his patients;

(i) Once every two weeks, the Clinical Monitor shall: (i) attend Dr. Piatek's practice to observe Dr. Piatek's care and treatment of two or more patients selected in accordance with the Clinical Monitor's discretion; and (ii) review at least ten patient records
randomly selected by the Clinical Monitor;

(j) The Clinical Monitor shall provide reports to the College once every three months in respect of Dr. Piatek's patient care and record keeping;

(k) The Clinical Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the College that the Clinical Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information that may be necessary for the Clinical Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Clinical Monitor in this regard.

(l) Dr. Piatek shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Monitor to the College, and by the College to his Clinical Monitor, of all information the Clinical Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Monitor's Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Piatek's compliance with the Order.

(m) The reports of Dr. Piatek's Clinical Monitor shall be provided by the College to the Psychiatric Monitor. The Psychiatric Monitor may request any further information from the Clinical Monitor or from the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or
desirable in order to permit the Psychiatric Monitor to perform the terms of the Undertaking;

(n) Dr. Piatek shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Monitor with respect to practice improvements and education;

(o) If the Psychiatric Monitor or the Clinical Monitor who has given the Undertaking is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr. Piatek shall cease to practise immediately until such time as he has retained another Psychiatric Monitor or Clinical
Monitor acceptable to the College;

(p) Dr. Piatek shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with the terms of this Order;

(q) This Order shall take effect 90 days after the date of the Order. The terms of the current Order under s. 62 of the Code shall remain in force until the terms of this Order take effect; and

(r) The clinical monitoring and the psychiatric monitoring described in this Order are to be for an indefinite period.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 19-20, May 17, July 31-Aug 2, Oct 1&5, 2012

Date of Decision: 12 Aug 2008
Summary of Decision:
On August 12, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Piatek to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and, that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Piatek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2. The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Piatek(s certificate of registration:

(a) Dr. Piatek shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course on the next available date and provide proof thereof to the College.

3. Dr. Piatek to pay to the College costs in the amount of $1,825.00 within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order.

4. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2008

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (3)

Date of Decision: 27 Nov 2013
Summary of Decision:
On November 27, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that his relevant to his suitability to practise, and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Piatek admitted the allegations.

On December 19, 2011, Dr. Piatek plead guilty to, and was convicted of, the following charge: that he did, in the city of Mississauga, between January 1, 2008 and July 30, 2009, submit billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits and did thereby commit an offense contrary to the Health Insurance Act, Section 44(1)(a).

Dr. Piatek has been found guilty of professional misconduct by the CPSO's Discipline Committee on one prior occasion. On August 12, 2008, he admitted to having been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice by willfully evading the payment of income taxes.

Dr. Piatek is currently subject to terms, conditions and limitations imposed by Order of the Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

Dr. Piatek attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Piatek pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 27, 2013

Proceeding Type: Incapacity referral to Fitness to Practise Committee
Date of Decision: 18 Apr 2013
Summary of Decision:
On April 18, 2013, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek is incapacitated, as defined in s. 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On October 2, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that the following terms, conditions and limitations be placed on Dr. Piatek's certificate of registration:

Dr. Piatek shall not engage in the practice of medicine unless he meets the following conditions:

(a) Within 90 days of this Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a qualified psychiatrist or psychologist with expertise in treatment of personality disorders and delusional disorder and acceptable to the College ("Psychiatric Monitor");

(b) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Psychiatric Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report of
Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr. Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the Undertaking described below, the Psychiatric Monitor shall be required to read and review all of the foregoing;

(c) The Psychiatric Monitor shall execute an Undertaking with the College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require the Psychiatric Monitor to:
(i) Provide written reports to the College every three months; and
(ii) If the psychiatric monitor determines that Dr. Piatek's condition may affect his care of patients, that he has failed to attend for appointments, or that he is not in compliance with this Order, the psychiatric monitor shall make an immediate report to the College.

(d) Dr. Piatek shall attend his Psychiatric Monitor for active psychotherapy at least once weekly, focussing on treatment of his condition and management of associated behaviors;

(e) The Psychiatric Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information that may be necessary for the Psychiatric Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Psychiatric Monitor in this regard.

(f) Within 90 days of the Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a clinical monitor ("Clinical Monitor") who is acceptable to the College;

(g) Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Clinical Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report of Dr.
Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr. Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the Undertaking described below, the Clinical Monitor shall be required to read and review all of the foregoing;

(h) The Clinical Monitor will execute an Undertaking with the College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require the Clinical Monitor to report to the College immediately if Dr. Piatek's patient care or record keeping represents a risk to his patients;

(i) Once every two weeks, the Clinical Monitor shall: (i) attend Dr. Piatek's practice to observe Dr. Piatek's care and treatment of two or more patients selected in accordance with the Clinical Monitor's discretion; and (ii) review at least ten patient records
randomly selected by the Clinical Monitor;

(j) The Clinical Monitor shall provide reports to the College once every three months in respect of Dr. Piatek's patient care and record keeping;

(k) The Clinical Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the College that the Clinical Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information that may be necessary for the Clinical Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Clinical Monitor in this regard.

(l) Dr. Piatek shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Monitor to the College, and by the College to his Clinical Monitor, of all information the Clinical Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Monitor's Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Piatek's compliance with the Order.

(m) The reports of Dr. Piatek's Clinical Monitor shall be provided by the College to the Psychiatric Monitor. The Psychiatric Monitor may request any further information from the Clinical Monitor or from the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or
desirable in order to permit the Psychiatric Monitor to perform the terms of the Undertaking;

(n) Dr. Piatek shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Monitor with respect to practice improvements and education;

(o) If the Psychiatric Monitor or the Clinical Monitor who has given the Undertaking is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr. Piatek shall cease to practise immediately until such time as he has retained another Psychiatric Monitor or Clinical
Monitor acceptable to the College;

(p) Dr. Piatek shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with the terms of this Order;

(q) This Order shall take effect 90 days after the date of the Order. The terms of the current Order under s. 62 of the Code shall remain in force until the terms of this Order take effect; and

(r) The clinical monitoring and the psychiatric monitoring described in this Order are to be for an indefinite period.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 19-20, May 17, July 31-Aug 2, Oct 1&5, 2012

Date of Decision: 12 Aug 2008
Summary of Decision:
On August 12, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Piatek to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and, that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Piatek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2. The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Piatek(s certificate of registration:

(a) Dr. Piatek shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course on the next available date and provide proof thereof to the College.

3. Dr. Piatek to pay to the College costs in the amount of $1,825.00 within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order.

4. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2008

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988