THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:18:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Fax: (905) 569-8630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hafiz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Fax: (905) 569-8630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hafiz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUJAUDDIN FAZALURRAHMAN HAFIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFIZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUJAUDDIN FAZALURRAHMAN HAFIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFIZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1988