THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:06:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1988