THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:59:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 30 Aug 2011
Summary of Decision:
On August 30, 2011, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Connolly's admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

On February 17, 2010, Dr. Connolly pleaded guilty and was found guilty of committing an offence under s.44(1)(a) of the Health Insurance Act, by submitting billings in the amount of $114,146.92 that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits. The offence was alleged to have occurred between April 1, 2005 and September 15, 2008. The parties presented an Agreed Statement of Fact in the court proceeding, the final paragraph of which states: "Dr. Connolly was not aware that the clinic owner was overbilling. However, Dr. Connolly's liability for this regulatory offence lies in his failure to exercise due diligence, that is in his failure to take all available, reasonable steps to ensure that the clinic owner had not overbilled."

The Court accepted a joint submission on sentence and ordered: a fine of $4,000, which totalled $5,000 with the 25% victim fine surcharge; and restitution in favour of the Minister of Finance for $114,146.92. This represented the total amount overbilled, including $34,000 that was received by the clinic owner. Dr. Connolly made full restitution as ordered.

Dr. Connolly has no prior history before the Discipline Committee.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Connolly to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Connolly to pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 30, 2011

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 30 Aug 2011
Summary of Decision:
On August 30, 2011, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Connolly's admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

On February 17, 2010, Dr. Connolly pleaded guilty and was found guilty of committing an offence under s.44(1)(a) of the Health Insurance Act, by submitting billings in the amount of $114,146.92 that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits. The offence was alleged to have occurred between April 1, 2005 and September 15, 2008. The parties presented an Agreed Statement of Fact in the court proceeding, the final paragraph of which states: "Dr. Connolly was not aware that the clinic owner was overbilling. However, Dr. Connolly's liability for this regulatory offence lies in his failure to exercise due diligence, that is in his failure to take all available, reasonable steps to ensure that the clinic owner had not overbilled."

The Court accepted a joint submission on sentence and ordered: a fine of $4,000, which totalled $5,000 with the 25% victim fine surcharge; and restitution in favour of the Minister of Finance for $114,146.92. This represented the total amount overbilled, including $34,000 that was received by the clinic owner. Dr. Connolly made full restitution as ordered.

Dr. Connolly has no prior history before the Discipline Committee.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Connolly to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Connolly to pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 30, 2011

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 1988