THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4335 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M9C 5S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 695-8878
Fax: (416) 695-2622

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4335 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M9C 5S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 695-8878
Fax: (416) 695-2622

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIEN THUAN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIEN THUAN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 10 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Feb 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 1989