THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2010 Winston Park Dr
Oakville ON L6H 5R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 569 1777
Fax: 905 569 8308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-2010 Winston Park Dr
Oakville ON L6H 5R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 569 1777
Fax: 905 569 8308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHINI MANGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHINI MANGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 1989