THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 23:15:49 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra K. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra K. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Mar 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alexandra Katharina Ursula Collins to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 6, 2018:

Dr. Collins was subject to a specified continuing education or remediation program relating to her emergency medicine practice, the components of which were not completed. Dr. Collins has agreed not to practise emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Mar 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alexandra Katharina Ursula Collins to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 6, 2018:

Dr. Collins was subject to a specified continuing education or remediation program relating to her emergency medicine practice, the components of which were not completed. Dr. Collins has agreed not to practise emergency medicine.

Training

Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 06 Mar 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1989
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 1989