THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 192 Thornway Ave
Thornhill ON L4J 7Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056606665
Fax: 9056600050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents looking for a copy of their medical records can contact Docudavit:

T: 1-888-781-9083
or
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 10 Oct 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 192 Thornway Ave
Thornhill ON L4J 7Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056606665
Fax: 9056600050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents looking for a copy of their medical records can contact Docudavit:

T: 1-888-781-9083
or
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 10 Oct 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARK WITTES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITTES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARK WITTES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITTES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1989