THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 71 King Street West
Suite 401
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-9793
Fax: (905) 273-7054
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: VIVA Mississauga Retirement Community
5575 Bonnie St
Mississauga ON L5M 0N8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 71 King Street West
Suite 401
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-9793
Fax: (905) 273-7054
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: VIVA Mississauga Retirement Community
5575 Bonnie St
Mississauga ON L5M 0N8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULINE LOIS FENTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULINE LOIS FENTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 13 Feb 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 17, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Pauline Lois Fenty in respect of an incident that took place in January 2004.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 13 Feb 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 17, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Pauline Lois Fenty in respect of an incident that took place in January 2004.

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1989