THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:35:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Ting Malone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ting Malone (CPSO#: 63531 ) Dr. S. Malone (CPSO#: 60753 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn C. Malone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Dec 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Ting Malone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ting Malone (CPSO#: 63531 ) Dr. S. Malone (CPSO#: 60753 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn C. Malone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Dec 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Mar 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989