THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:46:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Stern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Stern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 16 Apr 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 03 Sep 2024
Summary:

Findings of Guilt 

Robert Joseph Stern was found guilty of the following offence: 

1. Failure to Comply with a Condition of a  Release Order, contrary to section 145(5)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

Date: September 3, 2024 

SENTENCE:  90 day imprisonment consecutive to currently served sentence currently being served;  DNA Order. 



Source: Other
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2023
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Robert Stern was found guilty of the following offences:

1.  Possession of child pornography, contrary to Section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.  Making child pornography, contrary to Section 163.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3.  Voyeurism, contrary to Section 162(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: July 11, 2023
SENTENCE:  June 21, 2024
1.  For the finding of guilt under Section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code:   1 year and 3 months imprisonment (2 years less time credited pre-sentence custody).
2.  For the finding of guilt under Section  163.1(2) of the Criminal Code:   12 months, to be served concurrent with the sentence in #3.
3.  For the finding of guilt under Section 162(1) of the Criminal Code:   2 years to be served consecutive with  the sentence in #1.

Ancillary Orders
•    Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 20 years
•    DNA Order
•    Weapons Prohibition Order for 10 years (Section 109(2) of the Criminal Code)
•    An order under Section 161 of the Criminal Code prohibiting Robert Stern for 20 years (plus the imprisonment period) from:
(a)     attending a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre, unless in the presence of an adult who is aware of this criminal conviction.
(a.1)  being within metres of the dwelling-house where specified persons normally reside.
(b)     seeking, obtaining or continuing any employment, whether or not the employment is remunerated, or becoming or being a volunteer in a capacity that involves being in a position of trust or authority towards persons under the age of 16 years.
(c)     having any contact – including communicating by any means – with a person who is under the age of 16 years, unless the offender does so under the supervision of a person whom the court considers appropriate, unless in the presence of an adult who is aware of this criminal conviction.
(d)     Using the internet or other digital network, unless the offender does so in accordance with conditions set by the court.
i.   Not access upload download or search online for any images or movies or person under 16 modelling, exercising, in diapers, in the nude, or that are sexually suggestive.
ii.  Not to discuss sexual topics in any online forum, group chat, or group text/chat app service.
iii.  Not to access or join any chat room group, chat message board, listserv, or any other online group discussion where sexual topics are the primary topic of conversation.
iv. Not to use a VPN service or any other service or software which obscures your IP address, except as may be required for your employment.
v.  Not to use or download Freenet or similar censorship resistant program, and
vi.        Not to use the private browsing feature to access the internet (e.g. incognito browsing on Google Chrome) not to erase your browsing history, and not change

 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 29 Oct 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Joseph Stern to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2022:
 
A College investigation is being conducted into whether Dr. Stern engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Stern has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or service.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 16 Apr 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 03 Sep 2024
Summary:

Findings of Guilt 

Robert Joseph Stern was found guilty of the following offence: 

1. Failure to Comply with a Condition of a  Release Order, contrary to section 145(5)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

Date: September 3, 2024 

SENTENCE:  90 day imprisonment consecutive to currently served sentence currently being served;  DNA Order. 



Source: Other
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2023
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Robert Stern was found guilty of the following offences:

1.  Possession of child pornography, contrary to Section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.  Making child pornography, contrary to Section 163.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3.  Voyeurism, contrary to Section 162(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: July 11, 2023
SENTENCE:  June 21, 2024
1.  For the finding of guilt under Section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code:   1 year and 3 months imprisonment (2 years less time credited pre-sentence custody).
2.  For the finding of guilt under Section  163.1(2) of the Criminal Code:   12 months, to be served concurrent with the sentence in #3.
3.  For the finding of guilt under Section 162(1) of the Criminal Code:   2 years to be served consecutive with  the sentence in #1.

Ancillary Orders
•    Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 20 years
•    DNA Order
•    Weapons Prohibition Order for 10 years (Section 109(2) of the Criminal Code)
•    An order under Section 161 of the Criminal Code prohibiting Robert Stern for 20 years (plus the imprisonment period) from:
(a)     attending a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre, unless in the presence of an adult who is aware of this criminal conviction.
(a.1)  being within metres of the dwelling-house where specified persons normally reside.
(b)     seeking, obtaining or continuing any employment, whether or not the employment is remunerated, or becoming or being a volunteer in a capacity that involves being in a position of trust or authority towards persons under the age of 16 years.
(c)     having any contact – including communicating by any means – with a person who is under the age of 16 years, unless the offender does so under the supervision of a person whom the court considers appropriate, unless in the presence of an adult who is aware of this criminal conviction.
(d)     Using the internet or other digital network, unless the offender does so in accordance with conditions set by the court.
i.   Not access upload download or search online for any images or movies or person under 16 modelling, exercising, in diapers, in the nude, or that are sexually suggestive.
ii.  Not to discuss sexual topics in any online forum, group chat, or group text/chat app service.
iii.  Not to access or join any chat room group, chat message board, listserv, or any other online group discussion where sexual topics are the primary topic of conversation.
iv. Not to use a VPN service or any other service or software which obscures your IP address, except as may be required for your employment.
v.  Not to use or download Freenet or similar censorship resistant program, and
vi.        Not to use the private browsing feature to access the internet (e.g. incognito browsing on Google Chrome) not to erase your browsing history, and not change

 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 29 Oct 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Joseph Stern to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2022:
 
A College investigation is being conducted into whether Dr. Stern engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Stern has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or service.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989