THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:49:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2573 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2H 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 288-0417
Fax: 6136880315
Address: 225 Preston Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7R1
Phone: (613) 288-0437
Fax: 6136880315

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2573 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2H 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 288-0417
Fax: 6136880315
Address: 225 Preston Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7R1
Phone: (613) 288-0437
Fax: 6136880315

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
23 Aug 2004
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 23 2004
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 23, 2004, Dr. Thom Vernon Tyson undertakes to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that,

1. he will cease allergy testing and prescribing immunotherapy;

2. he will cease training other physicians in the area of allergy testing
and immunotherapy;

3. he will not operate a dilution lab for the preparation of immunotherapy
vaccines;

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 23, 2004, Dr. Thom Vernon Tyson undertakes to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that,

1. he will cease allergy testing and prescribing immunotherapy;

2. he will cease training other physicians in the area of allergy testing
and immunotherapy;

3. he will not operate a dilution lab for the preparation of immunotherapy
vaccines;

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989