THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite B
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 758-8626
Fax: (519) 758-9848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60875 ) Dr. P. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60957 )
Business Address: Suite B - 274 Lyden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6B8
(519) 758-8626

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite B
274 Lynden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 758-8626
Fax: (519) 758-9848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60875 ) Dr. P. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60957 )
Business Address: Suite B - 274 Lyden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6B8
(519) 758-8626

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC THOMSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC THOMSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989