THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:18:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 103-25 Elm Street
St Thomas, ON
N5R 1H5
Date Received: 09 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Balsdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 103-25 Elm Street
St Thomas, ON
N5R 1H5
Date Received: 09 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Balsdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 May 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989