THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctors Office
7125 Goreway Drive
Suite 201
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 405-8393
Fax: (905) 405-8972

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nanar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctors Office
7125 Goreway Drive
Suite 201
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 405-8393
Fax: (905) 405-8972

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nanar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BIKRAMJIT SINGH NANAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BIKRAMJIT SINGH NANAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989