THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:01:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Innovation Drive, Unit 1
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-8400
Fax: (866) 682-1419

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Innovation Drive, Unit 1
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-8400
Fax: (866) 682-1419

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERTO CANNITELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNITELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERTO CANNITELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNITELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989