THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maple Telemedicine
355 Adelaide St W
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5V 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
Address: 100-1 Av Holiday
Pointe-Claire QC H9R 5N3
Phone: (514) 375-2705
Fax: (514) 505-1770
Address: 3520 Rue De L'hêtrière
Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures QC G3A 0B4
Phone: 581 666 1666
Fax: 1 833 999 0841

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Quebec
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maple Telemedicine
355 Adelaide St W
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5V 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
Address: 100-1 Av Holiday
Pointe-Claire QC H9R 5N3
Phone: (514) 375-2705
Fax: (514) 505-1770
Address: 3520 Rue De L'hêtrière
Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures QC G3A 0B4
Phone: 581 666 1666
Fax: 1 833 999 0841

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Quebec
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT SCOTT SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT SCOTT SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989