THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:00:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Pediatric Consultation Clinic
30 The Queensway
3rd Floor OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: 416-530-6294
Address: Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1H5
Phone: 4168181998
Fax: No Information Available
Address: College Street
350 College Street
#500
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 818-1998
Fax: 416-922-6668
Address: Tropical Disease Unit
Norman Urquhart Building - 13th Fl
UHN, Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 3675
Fax: 416 340 3260

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Pediatric Consultation Clinic
30 The Queensway
3rd Floor OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: 416-530-6294
Address: Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1H5
Phone: 4168181998
Fax: No Information Available
Address: College Street
350 College Street
#500
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 818-1998
Fax: 416-922-6668
Address: Tropical Disease Unit
Norman Urquhart Building - 13th Fl
UHN, Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 3675
Fax: 416 340 3260

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA BANERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA BANERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989