THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ohio State University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 330
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-5996
Fax: (416) 461-6479
Address: Suite 215
6633 Highway #7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: (905) 472-6534
Address: Unit 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: (905) 881-1721

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Ohio State University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 330
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-5996
Fax: (416) 461-6479
Address: Suite 215
6633 Highway #7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: (905) 472-6534
Address: Unit 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X3
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: (905) 881-1721

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRIS KONSTANTINOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONSTANTINOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRIS KONSTANTINOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONSTANTINOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ohio State University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1989