THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:23:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Extension: 6522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Extension: 6522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN NICHOLAS WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN NICHOLAS WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989