THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:02:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137149855
Fax: 6137149857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137149855
Fax: 6137149857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD REDMOND MICHAEL O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD REDMOND MICHAEL O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989