THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GANDA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 525 2222
Extension: 4177
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Uganda

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Kagoma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kagoma (CPSO#: 61643 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
613 525 2222 Extn: 4177

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GANDA
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 525 2222
Extension: 4177
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Uganda

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Kagoma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kagoma (CPSO#: 61643 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
613 525 2222 Extn: 4177

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER KYAMBADDE KAGOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGOMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER KYAMBADDE KAGOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGOMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 23 Feb 2018
Summary:
“On February 23, 2018, the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners ordered a suspension, without a hearing, of Dr. Kagoma’s license to practice medicine and surgery in the State of New Jersey. This order was issued after the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners received notice of the specified continuing education and remediation program (SCERP) ordered by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in June 8, 2016 (see Concerns for more information on the College’s action). Dr. Kagoma’s license lapsed in New Jersey in 1989 due to failure to renew. The CPSO was notified of this order by a report dated May 3, 2018.

The New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners has stated this order of summary suspension is administrative and is not considered to be a disciplinary action against Dr. Kagoma’s licence.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Jun 2016
Summary:
Dr. Kagoma has completed all requirements of the SCERP effective September 27, 2018

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 23 Feb 2018
Summary:
“On February 23, 2018, the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners ordered a suspension, without a hearing, of Dr. Kagoma’s license to practice medicine and surgery in the State of New Jersey. This order was issued after the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners received notice of the specified continuing education and remediation program (SCERP) ordered by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in June 8, 2016 (see Concerns for more information on the College’s action). Dr. Kagoma’s license lapsed in New Jersey in 1989 due to failure to renew. The CPSO was notified of this order by a report dated May 3, 2018.

The New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners has stated this order of summary suspension is administrative and is not considered to be a disciplinary action against Dr. Kagoma’s licence.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Jun 2016
Summary:
Dr. Kagoma has completed all requirements of the SCERP effective September 27, 2018

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP.

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1989