THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5300 Ch De La Côte-Des-Neiges
Montréal QC H3T 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-738-5306
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1665 Rue Sainte-Catherine
Montréal Québec H3H 1L9
Phone: 5149310801
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 160 Av Stillview
Pointe-Claire QC H9R 2Y2
Phone: 5146302225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5300 Ch De La Côte-Des-Neiges
Montréal QC H3T 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-738-5306
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1665 Rue Sainte-Catherine
Montréal Québec H3H 1L9
Phone: 5149310801
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 160 Av Stillview
Pointe-Claire QC H9R 2Y2
Phone: 5146302225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK LEVENTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENTAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK LEVENTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENTAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 1989