THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:48:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medicine Clinic- Riverside Campus
6Th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 81558
Fax: (613) 738-8373

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medicine Clinic- Riverside Campus
6Th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 81558
Fax: (613) 738-8373

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG MURRAY CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG MURRAY CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 1989