THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:23:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dixon Medical Centre
Suite 402
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6733
Fax: (905) 836-5581

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Paramsothy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dixon Medical Centre
Suite 402
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6733
Fax: (905) 836-5581

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Paramsothy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASIAH PARAMSOTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMSOTHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASIAH PARAMSOTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMSOTHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1989