THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:33:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 965
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 3204
Fax: (416) 586-5970

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALLAN PETERKIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 965
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 3204
Fax: (416) 586-5970

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALLAN PETERKIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN DAVID PETERKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN DAVID PETERKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1989