THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:55:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 102
1057 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 972-8382
Fax: (905) 972-8600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Jul 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rolando R. Cepeda Medicine Professional Corporatio
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 102
1057 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 972-8382
Fax: (905) 972-8600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Jul 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rolando R. Cepeda Medicine Professional Corporatio
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLANDO RUIZ CEPEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUIZ CEPEDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLANDO RUIZ CEPEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUIZ CEPEDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 1989