THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:20:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Oct 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 1990