THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:40:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin M. S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin M. S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Jan 2017
Summary of Decision:
On January 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Martin M.S. Lee committed an act of professional misconduct in that: he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful dishonorable and unprofessional.

Dr. Lee is a rheumatologist. During the relevant time period, Dr. Lee practised in both Pickering and Mississauga. Dr. Lee saw these patients for the treatment of pain and fibromyalgia between January 2008 and June 2012.

Regarding Patient A, Dr. Lee engaged in sexual abuse by asking her inappropriate and personal questions about her sex life and by showing and discussing a pornographic magazine with her. These were remarks and gestures of a sexual nature. He engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful dishonorable and unprofessional by (i) making remarks and gestures of a sexual nature as described above; (ii) asking her to pay cash for prescriptions; (iii) asking her to fill a prescription for Flamazine for him; and (iv) asking her to video or photograph other patients.

Regarding Patient C, Dr. Lee engaged in sexual abuse in that on one occasion, he inappropriately rubbed his groin against her right hip area while administering a trigger point injection. This was contact of a sexual nature. Dr. Lee also sexually abused Patient C by using sexually explicit and crude language when asking her personal questions about her sex life. These were remarks of a sexual nature.

Further, Dr. Lee’s line of questioning with respect to Patient C’s personal sex life, and his choice of words when asking these questions would reasonably be regarded by members of the profession as disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional.

Disposition

On November 2, 2017 the Discipline Committee made an order on the matter of penalty and costs.

Appeal

On December 1, 2017, Dr. Lee appealed the decisions on finding and penalty of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice of Ontario (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remained in effect, despite the appeal.

On July 19, 2019, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal of the Committee’s January 28, 2017 decision on finding and granted the appeal of the November 2, 2017 decision on penalty. The Divisional Court directed that Dr. Lee is required to post security for reimbursement for funding under the program under section 85.7 of the Code with respect to Patient A only. The Divisional Court also directed that the panel of the Discipline Committee that originally heard the case hear and decide the remaining issues of penalty.

On August 12, 2019, the College filed a notice of motion seeking leave to appeal to the Court of Appeal the decision of the Divisional Court. On November 1, 2019, the Court of Appeal dismissed the College’s motion for leave to appeal.

Penalty Decision following Appellate Return
On March 17, 2020, pursuant to the decision of the Divisional Court, the Committee held a penalty hearing. In summary, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that:

- The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Lee’s certificate of registration, effective immediately, related to:

Practice Monitor and Patient Log
Notification of Practice Locations
Posting a Sign and Translations
Notifying Patients
Monitoring of Compliance
Professional Education
Cost of Implementation

- Dr. Lee is to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

- Dr. Lee is to reimburse the College for funding under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within seventy-five (75) days of the date of this Order in the amount of $16,060.00.

- Dr. Lee is to pay costs to the College in the amount of $20,500.00, within seventy-five (75) days of the date of this Order.

More details can be found in the reasons for decision linked below.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Allowed
Appeal Decision Date: 2019-07-19
Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2016-07-18 to 19 and 2016-07-21 to 22; Penalty: 2017-05-02 and 2020-03-17; Reprimand: 2020-08-18

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Jan 2017
Summary of Decision:
On January 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Martin M.S. Lee committed an act of professional misconduct in that: he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful dishonorable and unprofessional.

Dr. Lee is a rheumatologist. During the relevant time period, Dr. Lee practised in both Pickering and Mississauga. Dr. Lee saw these patients for the treatment of pain and fibromyalgia between January 2008 and June 2012.

Regarding Patient A, Dr. Lee engaged in sexual abuse by asking her inappropriate and personal questions about her sex life and by showing and discussing a pornographic magazine with her. These were remarks and gestures of a sexual nature. He engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful dishonorable and unprofessional by (i) making remarks and gestures of a sexual nature as described above; (ii) asking her to pay cash for prescriptions; (iii) asking her to fill a prescription for Flamazine for him; and (iv) asking her to video or photograph other patients.

Regarding Patient C, Dr. Lee engaged in sexual abuse in that on one occasion, he inappropriately rubbed his groin against her right hip area while administering a trigger point injection. This was contact of a sexual nature. Dr. Lee also sexually abused Patient C by using sexually explicit and crude language when asking her personal questions about her sex life. These were remarks of a sexual nature.

Further, Dr. Lee’s line of questioning with respect to Patient C’s personal sex life, and his choice of words when asking these questions would reasonably be regarded by members of the profession as disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional.

Disposition

On November 2, 2017 the Discipline Committee made an order on the matter of penalty and costs.

Appeal

On December 1, 2017, Dr. Lee appealed the decisions on finding and penalty of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice of Ontario (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remained in effect, despite the appeal.

On July 19, 2019, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal of the Committee’s January 28, 2017 decision on finding and granted the appeal of the November 2, 2017 decision on penalty. The Divisional Court directed that Dr. Lee is required to post security for reimbursement for funding under the program under section 85.7 of the Code with respect to Patient A only. The Divisional Court also directed that the panel of the Discipline Committee that originally heard the case hear and decide the remaining issues of penalty.

On August 12, 2019, the College filed a notice of motion seeking leave to appeal to the Court of Appeal the decision of the Divisional Court. On November 1, 2019, the Court of Appeal dismissed the College’s motion for leave to appeal.

Penalty Decision following Appellate Return
On March 17, 2020, pursuant to the decision of the Divisional Court, the Committee held a penalty hearing. In summary, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that:

- The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Lee’s certificate of registration, effective immediately, related to:

Practice Monitor and Patient Log
Notification of Practice Locations
Posting a Sign and Translations
Notifying Patients
Monitoring of Compliance
Professional Education
Cost of Implementation

- Dr. Lee is to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

- Dr. Lee is to reimburse the College for funding under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within seventy-five (75) days of the date of this Order in the amount of $16,060.00.

- Dr. Lee is to pay costs to the College in the amount of $20,500.00, within seventy-five (75) days of the date of this Order.

More details can be found in the reasons for decision linked below.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Allowed
Appeal Decision Date: 2019-07-19
Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2016-07-18 to 19 and 2016-07-21 to 22; Penalty: 2017-05-02 and 2020-03-17; Reprimand: 2020-08-18

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2019
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990