THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:26:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical Record requests should be directed to Dr. J. Gawlik via the following methods:

E-mail: [email protected] or phone number: 613-286-4160
Date Received: 20 Mar 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janusz D. Gawlik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2024

Corporation Name: Janusz D. Gawlik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical Record requests should be directed to Dr. J. Gawlik via the following methods:

E-mail: [email protected] or phone number: 613-286-4160
Date Received: 20 Mar 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janusz D. Gawlik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2024

Corporation Name: Janusz D. Gawlik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 1990