THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:59:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 774 Echo Drive
The Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196197870
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Office hours: Monday to Friday, 8 a.m. to 4 p.m.
Mailing address: 800 Commissioners Rd. E., Room C1-700, P.O. Box 5010, Stn. B, London, ON, N6A 5W9
Telephone: 519-685-8500, extension 52865
Fax: 519-685-8272
Date Received: 24 Apr 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 774 Echo Drive
The Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196197870
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Office hours: Monday to Friday, 8 a.m. to 4 p.m.
Mailing address: 800 Commissioners Rd. E., Room C1-700, P.O. Box 5010, Stn. B, London, ON, N6A 5W9
Telephone: 519-685-8500, extension 52865
Fax: 519-685-8272
Date Received: 24 Apr 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN WATLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATLING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN WATLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATLING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990