THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1990