THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:13:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pace Cardiology
Little Lake Medical Centre
Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-4422
Fax: (705) 721-5577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley J. Dibble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pace Cardiology
Little Lake Medical Centre
Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-4422
Fax: (705) 721-5577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley J. Dibble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY JON DIBBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIBBLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY JON DIBBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIBBLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990