THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:29:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 408
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 570-1492
Fax: (519) 570-3387

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Pineau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pineau (CPSO#: 62175 )
Business Address: 408 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 570-1492

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 408
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 570-1492
Fax: (519) 570-3387

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Pineau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pineau (CPSO#: 62175 )
Business Address: 408 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 570-1492

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ANN PINEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ANN PINEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990