THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:20:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Munk 11 127
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3057
Fax: (416) 340-3109

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Respirology
Effective: 15 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Munk 11 127
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3057
Fax: (416) 340-3109

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Respirology
Effective: 15 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET SUTHERLAND HERRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET SUTHERLAND HERRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990