THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:44:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hugh Allen Clinic
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: (807) 737-1771
Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Yahwin Health
Centre
PO Box 909
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: (807) 737-5260

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hugh Allen Clinic
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: (807) 737-1771
Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Yahwin Health
Centre
PO Box 909
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: (807) 737-5260

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH PATRICK ANTHONY DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH PATRICK ANTHONY DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1990