THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:40:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 177 King Street East
CK Public Health
Chatham Ontario N7M 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193550848
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 435 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 3Z4
Phone: 9059779531
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 12 Gilbertson Dr
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 4N5
Phone: (519) 426-6170
Fax: 5195823579

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 177 King Street East
CK Public Health
Chatham Ontario N7M 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193550848
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 435 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 3Z4
Phone: 9059779531
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 12 Gilbertson Dr
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 4N5
Phone: (519) 426-6170
Fax: 5195823579

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANKER NESATHURAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESATHURAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANKER NESATHURAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESATHURAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990