THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: Carlos, Deirdre Prudence (Used Until: 05 Jun 2008)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21020
175 hampton road
quispamsis
st john New Brunswick E2E 4Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 847-1232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
PO Box 21031
175 Old Hampton Road
Quispamsis, New Brunswick
E2E 4Z4
Date Received: 23 Sep 2009

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

General Information

Former Name: Carlos, Deirdre Prudence (Used Until: 05 Jun 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21020
175 hampton road
quispamsis
st john New Brunswick E2E 4Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 847-1232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
PO Box 21031
175 Old Hampton Road
Quispamsis, New Brunswick
E2E 4Z4
Date Received: 23 Sep 2009

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEIRDRE PRUDENCE ENGLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEIRDRE PRUDENCE ENGLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990