THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:54:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Suite 2102
London Ontario N6G 2M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Extension: 22119
Fax: (519) 858-5167

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Petrella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Petrella (CPSO#: 62275 )
Business Address: Western Centre for Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Second Floor
London Ontario N6G 2M1
(519) 661-2111 Extn: 22119

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Suite 2102
London Ontario N6G 2M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Extension: 22119
Fax: (519) 858-5167

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Petrella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Petrella (CPSO#: 62275 )
Business Address: Western Centre for Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Second Floor
London Ontario N6G 2M1
(519) 661-2111 Extn: 22119

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN PETRELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN PETRELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990