THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite I E 442
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5851
Fax: (416) 603-3437
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Room S-107
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6439
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite I E 442
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5851
Fax: (416) 603-3437
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Room S-107
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6439
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOEL LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOEL LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990