THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Rossland Road East
suite 202
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-660-2761
Fax: 289-660-2763

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Rossland Road East
suite 202
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-660-2761
Fax: 289-660-2763

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANNE TUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANNE TUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Dec 2023
Summary of Decision:
On December 15, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Turek engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to her communications on her publicly available social media accounts and other online forums regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. Dr. Turek’s online communications included:
  • Inappropriate criticism of public health and government policies regarding COVID-19 that promoted prolonged lockdowns, masking, and vaccine mandates;
  • Promotion of Ivermectin/Hydroxychloroquine to treat COVID-19, contrary to public health recommendations;
  • Inappropriate criticism of the College due to its stances in support of public health recommendations around COVID-19 issues; and
  • Assertions that COVID-19 vaccines are unsafe and opposing vaccine mandates.
The Tribunal ordered that:   
  1. Dr. Turek attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Turek’s certificate of registration for two months commencing December 16, 2023 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. Dr. Turek pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 15, 2024.  
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand: 2023-12-15

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Dec 2023
Summary of Decision:
On December 15, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Turek engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to her communications on her publicly available social media accounts and other online forums regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. Dr. Turek’s online communications included:
  • Inappropriate criticism of public health and government policies regarding COVID-19 that promoted prolonged lockdowns, masking, and vaccine mandates;
  • Promotion of Ivermectin/Hydroxychloroquine to treat COVID-19, contrary to public health recommendations;
  • Inappropriate criticism of the College due to its stances in support of public health recommendations around COVID-19 issues; and
  • Assertions that COVID-19 vaccines are unsafe and opposing vaccine mandates.
The Tribunal ordered that:   
  1. Dr. Turek attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Turek’s certificate of registration for two months commencing December 16, 2023 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. Dr. Turek pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 15, 2024.  
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand: 2023-12-15

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 16 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2024
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 16 Dec 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990