THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:06:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil Ontario L0S 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 468-3275
Fax: (905) 468-7960

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil Ontario L0S 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 468-3275
Fax: (905) 468-7960

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIE RICCIARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCIARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIE RICCIARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCIARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990