THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:44:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cairns Hospital
165/171 Esplanade
Cairns Queensland 4870
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +61742260000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-11 Highleigh Road
Gordonvale Queensland Australia 4865
Phone: +0740433100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jul 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cairns Hospital
165/171 Esplanade
Cairns Queensland 4870
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +61742260000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-11 Highleigh Road
Gordonvale Queensland Australia 4865
Phone: +0740433100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jul 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD ROSS MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD ROSS MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990