THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:25:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 509
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-3254
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.L. Bishop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 509
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-3254
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.L. Bishop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN LESLIE BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN LESLIE BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990