THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Augusta Central Pharmacy
360 College Street
Toronto, Ontario
M5T1S6
Telephone 416 9616692
Fax 416 9614078
Date Received: 09 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Augusta Central Pharmacy
360 College Street
Toronto, Ontario
M5T1S6
Telephone 416 9616692
Fax 416 9614078
Date Received: 09 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990