THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:01:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-9895
Fax: (416) 299-9221
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite B15
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 4167593462
Fax: 4167599237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P Garces Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-9895
Fax: (416) 299-9221
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite B15
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 4167593462
Fax: 4167599237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P Garces Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
17 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 17th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Patricio Borromeo Garces in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garces to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. PATRICIO BORROMEO GARCES
(“Dr. Garces”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Garces, certificate of registration number 62837, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that following two public complaints, the College conducted investigations bearing File Numbers CAS-438793-R6P0W7 and CAS-436725-W0C3G8 (the “Investigations”) into my reading and interpretation of CT scans on two patients.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Garces, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Garces, undertake that I will not read or interpret CT scans.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Garces, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Garces, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Garces, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(12) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Following two public complaints, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Garces’ reading and interpretation of CT scans on two patients. As a result of the investigations, Dr. Garces will not read or interpret CT scans.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Garces, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Garces, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 17th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Patricio Borromeo Garces in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garces to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. PATRICIO BORROMEO GARCES
(“Dr. Garces”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Garces, certificate of registration number 62837, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that following two public complaints, the College conducted investigations bearing File Numbers CAS-438793-R6P0W7 and CAS-436725-W0C3G8 (the “Investigations”) into my reading and interpretation of CT scans on two patients.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Garces, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Garces, undertake that I will not read or interpret CT scans.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Garces, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Garces, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Garces, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(12) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Garces, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Following two public complaints, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Garces’ reading and interpretation of CT scans on two patients. As a result of the investigations, Dr. Garces will not read or interpret CT scans.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Garces, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Garces, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Jan 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patricio Borromeo Garces to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 17th, 2024:
 
Following two public complaints, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Garces’ reading and interpretation of CT scans on two patients.  As a result of the investigations, Dr. Garces will not read or interpret CT scans.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Jan 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patricio Borromeo Garces to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 17th, 2024:
 
Following two public complaints, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Garces’ reading and interpretation of CT scans on two patients.  As a result of the investigations, Dr. Garces will not read or interpret CT scans.
 

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990