THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:38:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Saad Hussain
Unit 10
5153 Tomken Road
Mississauga, ON
L4W 1P1
Phone: 1-905-275-8226
Date Received: 20 Sep 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thai Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Saad Hussain
Unit 10
5153 Tomken Road
Mississauga, ON
L4W 1P1
Phone: 1-905-275-8226
Date Received: 20 Sep 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thai Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 08 Apr 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ngo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 8th, 2022:
 
Allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Ngo were referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, namely allegations that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and that she contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.
 
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Ngo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Aug 2018
Summary:
Dr. Ngo has voluntarily limited her practice to Vietnamese and French-speaking individuals. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 08 Apr 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ngo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 8th, 2022:
 
Allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Ngo were referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, namely allegations that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and that she contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.
 
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Ngo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Aug 2018
Summary:
Dr. Ngo has voluntarily limited her practice to Vietnamese and French-speaking individuals. 

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1990