THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 3
246 Dundas St S
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 267-7388
Fax: (844) 453-3558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. M. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brown (CPSO#: 62883 )
Business Address: Suite 3
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
Business Address: 56 Haskell Road
Cambridge Ontario N1P 1G7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 3
246 Dundas St S
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 267-7388
Fax: (844) 453-3558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. M. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brown (CPSO#: 62883 )
Business Address: Suite 3
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
Business Address: 56 Haskell Road
Cambridge Ontario N1P 1G7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARK BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARK BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Nov 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1990