THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:24:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 219 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 696-0003
Fax: 416 696-0022
Address: Cleveland Clinic Canada Midtown
150 Eglinton Avenue E., 5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E8
Phone: 416 507-6600
Fax: 416 507-6750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 219 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 696-0003
Fax: 416 696-0022
Address: Cleveland Clinic Canada Midtown
150 Eglinton Avenue E., 5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E8
Phone: 416 507-6600
Fax: 416 507-6750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK PHILPOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILPOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK PHILPOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILPOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1990