THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Surgical Associates
suite 7 2155 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 4M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2021

Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Surgical Associates
suite 7 2155 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 4M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2021

Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL BENJAMIN WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL BENJAMIN WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1990